IDFPR is composed of several agencies, bureaus and commissions that influence business growth and job creation through regulation.
Licenses set to lapse during week ending November 1
License Holder | License Type | Lapse Date | Issued Date |
---|---|---|---|
Charmaine C. Battistoni | Nail Technician | 2020-10-31 | 1994-05-19 |
Manh Le V | Nail Technician | 2020-10-31 | 1994-12-27 |
Susan A. Piller | Nail Technician | 2020-10-31 | 1997-09-11 |
Brigitte D. Lynn | Nail Technician | 2020-10-31 | 1999-03-30 |
Mary J. Darin | Nail Technician | 2020-10-31 | 2003-03-27 |
Linda M. Sula | Nail Technician | 2020-10-31 | 2003-12-11 |
Christi L. Benson | Nail Technician | 2020-10-31 | 2004-01-22 |
Cheryl L. Kingsbury | Nail Technician | 2020-10-31 | 2006-02-07 |
Meidi T. Castelluccio | Nail Technician | 2020-10-31 | 2015-06-08 |
Lori T. Grazulis | Nail Technician | 2020-10-31 | 2015-12-23 |
Thuy D. Le | Nail Technician | 2020-10-31 | 2016-08-22 |
Van Nguyen | Nail Technician | 2020-10-31 | 2017-11-07 |
Honig Realt, Inc. | Real Estate Branch Office | 2020-10-31 | 1998-12-16 |
Advantage Realt, Inc. | Real Estate Broker Corp. | 2020-10-31 | 1992-07-15 |
Coleman-Hornsb, Inc. | Real Estate Broker Corp. | 2020-10-31 | 1994-08-19 |
Richard a Olson & Associate, Inc. | Real Estate Broker Corp. | 2020-10-31 | 2001-02-05 |
Marquette Propertie, Inc. | Real Estate Broker Corp. | 2020-10-31 | 2003-10-02 |
Vicmar, Inc. | Real Estate Broker Corp. | 2020-10-31 | 2006-11-16 |
Nikko Estate, Inc. | Real Estate Broker Corp. | 2020-10-31 | 2011-02-15 |
A1 Real Estat, Inc. | Real Estate Broker Corp. | 2020-10-31 | 2015-05-19 |
Kelli Sheppard | Registered Agent-in-Charge | 2020-10-28 | 2019-10-28 |